House
|
02/15/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-10-23 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-01-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to HLT, HET, CPC, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|