House | 02/07/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Lowen, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |