Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 776) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite, Elefante, Fevella, Fukunaga, Inouye, McKelvey, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1835) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 03-21-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 177).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 994), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Lowen, Onishi, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Amato, Hussey-Burdick; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 330) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Hashimoto, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-23 11:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-23.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|