House
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 539), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Hussey-Burdick, Gates; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Onishi, Tam; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Belatti, Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to CPC, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|