Senate | 03/09/2023 | Referred to JDC. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Passed First Reading. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 72). | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tam excused (1). | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 789) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |