Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to PSM/WTL/HOU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 73).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cochran, Kobayashi, La Chica voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Hussey-Burdick, Kapela, Lowen, Marten, Perruso, Tam voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 905), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ganaden voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Friday, 02-03-23 9:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|