Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Act 230, 07/06/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Act 230, on 07/06/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1333).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 890).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 875).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 874).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Elefante Co-Chair; Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tam, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Kahaloa, Martinez, Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 782) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1821) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 345).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1070) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 599) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-15-23 10:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|