House | 02/24/2023 | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Pending introduction. |