House | 02/07/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 91) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HLT, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Pending introduction. |