House | 02/14/2023 | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-23. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Pending introduction. |