Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee on EET deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Re-Referred to EET/HWN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to EET/HWN, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 02-24-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-16-23 9:15AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EEP, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|