Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 621) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HLT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HLT.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-07-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EDN, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|