Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Act 069, 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Act 069, on 06/07/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1169).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 899).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Deferred one day 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 896).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 892).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 03-21-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 943).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 463).
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Keith-Agaran). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-20-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 10).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|