House
|
05/02/2023
|
Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 16).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 16) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Tarnas, Cochran, Kahaloa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-23 9:10AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-24-23 11:06AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Gates, Tarnas Co-Chairs; Cochran, Kahaloa, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Richards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 799) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1709) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) McKelvey ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 03-29-23 10:01AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1055) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 553) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 02-13-23 2:20PM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|