Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Act 044, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Act 044, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 899).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Quinlan excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Deferred one day 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 895).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 801) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Reported from HHS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1408) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HHS/GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 91).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 924), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 760), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-16-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 196) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|