Hawaii 2023 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB978 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 7, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023