House
|
04/20/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 923) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-20-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1915) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-23 1:10PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 469).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1666) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HLT, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|