House
|
04/24/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 964).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-24-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1968) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Re-Referred to AEN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to AEN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 640).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1996), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1722) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|