House
|
04/21/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 937).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-21-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1929) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Referred to HWN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 625).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1968), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|