House
|
03/31/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from TRN/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1816), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Morikawa, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Marten, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Onishi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN/LMG on Tuesday, 03-28-23 11:15AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to TRN/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|