Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
One (1) day notice, Thursday, 04-27-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 967) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-24-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1951) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 520).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1856) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to TRN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|