Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to EDU.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 658).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2048), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1696), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Todd, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|