Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to HHS/CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 659).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2050), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from CPC/LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1799), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Morikawa, Kitagawa; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC/LMG on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to CPC/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|