House
|
04/24/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 970).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-24-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1966) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1980), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-31-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Re-referred to JHA, referral sheet 26
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|