House
|
04/18/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 894).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-18-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1903) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 484).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1776) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to WAL, referral sheet 16
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
To be offered.
|
|
|