LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR26
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HCR26
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2023 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HCR26
Action History
House
03/23/2023
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
03/21/2023
Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
03/21/2023
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
03/03/2023
Referred to HLT, FIN , referral sheet 16
House
03/02/2023
Offered
House
02/27/2023
To be offered.