House
|
04/24/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 951).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-24-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported from GVO/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1953) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred to GVO/TCA.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 631).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1990), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-22-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
To be offered.
|
|
|