House | 03/31/2023 | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6). | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1807), recommending referral to FIN. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:10PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to CPC, FIN , referral sheet 18 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Offered | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To be offered. |