Senate | 03/31/2023 | Referred to EDU. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 489). | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Transmitted to Senate. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1733), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Todd, Garcia. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to EDN, referral sheet 18 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Offered | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To be offered. |