Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to HRE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1840), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Re-referred to HET, referral sheet 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to HET/HLT, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
To be offered.
|
|
|