Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
One (1) day notice, Thursday, 04-27-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 898) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-18-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1906) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Fevella, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Keohokalole.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to HWN/WTL.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 497).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1750) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Martinez, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-22-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to CAI, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To be offered.
|
|
|