Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 891).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
One (1) day notice, Thursday, 04-27-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 922) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
One Day Notice 04-20-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1914) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Referred to HHS/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 501).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1766), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-28-23 9:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to WAL, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|