Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred to CPN. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 583). | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Transmitted to Senate. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1908), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:10PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |