House | 03/29/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1665) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |