House
|
03/30/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from EEP/CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP/CMV on Tuesday, 03-28-23 11:05AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to EEP/CMV, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|