House | 04/05/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2). | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1977) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-31-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |