House | 04/04/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno excused (1). | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1967), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama, Kong. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |