House
|
04/05/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2017), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1703), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|