House | 04/05/2023 | Recommitted to JHA with none voting no and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Deferred one day 04-05-23. | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1969), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama, Kong. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |