House | 03/31/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6). | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1855) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |