House | 04/03/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1895), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kapela, Martinez. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Wednesday, 03-29-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to LGO, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |