House | 03/31/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6). | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1843) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-29-23 10:45AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to ECD, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |