House
|
04/05/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2031), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1645) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 10:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|