House
|
04/05/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2037), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lamosao, Pierick, Saiki excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1603), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:00AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|