House | 03/30/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1755) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-28-23 10:45AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Re-referred to EEP, referral sheet 23 | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Referred to EEP/WAL, referral sheet 20 | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Offered |