House | 03/30/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1757), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-28-23 10:45AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Re-referred to EEP, referral sheet 23 | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to EEP/WAL , referral sheet 16 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Offered | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | To be offered. |