House | 03/29/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1669), recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to EEP, referral sheet 18 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Offered | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To be offered. |