House
|
04/24/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2240) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Kila, Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Alcos, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-19-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1806), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:10PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
To be offered.
|
|
|