House | 03/30/2023 | Resolution adopted in final form. | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1759) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson, Garcia. | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-22-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Referred to HET, referral sheet 18 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Offered | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | To be offered. |