House
|
03/31/2023
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kila, Poepoe, Quinlan excused (6).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported from ECD/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1841) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Evslin, La Chica, Quinlan, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD/HET on Wednesday, 03-29-23 10:30AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred to ECD/HET, referral sheet 20
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To be offered.
|
|
|